FL H7019 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public records requirements for certain criminal intelligence & criminal investigative information that reveal identity of certain human trafficking victims.
Title
OGSR/Human Trafficking Victims
Sponsors
House Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee | Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Toby Overdorf [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#607 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#607 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Chapter No. 2020-170 | |
2020-09-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-09-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7036 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7036 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7019
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |