FL H7017 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring any state agency or political subdivision to disclose certain gifts or grants received from any foreign source to the Department of Financial Services within a specified timeframe; requiring any entity that applies for a certain grant or proposes a certain contract to disclose to a state agency or political subdivision any current or prior interest of, contract with, or grant or gift received from a foreign country of concern under certain circumstances; requiring institutions of higher education to semiannually report to certain entities regarding certain gifts they received directly or indirectly from a foreign source; authorizing a whistle-blower to report an undisclosed foreign gift to the Attorney General or the Chief Financial Officer; authorizing the Chief Financial Officer to incur expenditures to provide such reward from the penalty recovery; requiring certain state universities and other entities to screen certain foreign applicants seeking employment in specified research positions; requiring certain state universities and other entities to establish an international travel approval and monitoring program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign Influence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#60 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#99 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09 Chapter No. 2021-76
2021-06-07 Approved by Governor
2021-06-04 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 2010
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-13HouseAmendment 207711 adopted
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HouseAmendment 207711 filed
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-08HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-08HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-07House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-07HouseCS Filed
2021-04-07HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-07HouseReported out of State Affairs Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2021-03-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2021-03-22HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2021-03-17HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2021-03-17HouseReported out of Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-17HouseFavorable by Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-15HouseAdded to Education & Employment Committee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-05House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2010 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7017 (Ch. 2021-76)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
286101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288860Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Amendment/662889/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Amendment/207711/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017.EEC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017a.EEC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017b.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017c.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017d.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017e.SAC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Analyses/h7017z.PIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Vote/HouseVote_h07017e1099.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7017/Vote/SenateVote_h07017e1060.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58701&IsPCB=0&BillId=72872
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58931&IsPCB=0&BillId=72872
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59900&IsPCB=0&BillId=72872

Bill Comments 750

feedback