FL H7017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 186 (Ch. 2019-46)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "killing of victim of mass violence"; expands existing exemption to include photograph or video or audio recording held by agency that depicts or records killing of victim of mass violence; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Photographs or Video or Audio Recordings that Depict or Record the Killing of a Victim of Mass Violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 186 (Ch. 2019-46)
2019-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-21HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2019-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H577 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 186 (Ch. 2019-46)
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-46

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
406136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback