FL H7015 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes insured & repair company to enter into assignment agreement for post-loss benefits to repair, replace, protect, & mitigate damaged property; requires notice of intent to initiate litigation & award of attorney fees for claims under assignment agreement; prohibits insurance policies from prohibiting assignment of post-loss benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Insurance Assignment Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#503 (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HousePassed; YEAS 82 NAYS 20 330
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time 330
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-11-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2017-11-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S62 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S256 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1168 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback