FL H7013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends scheduled repeal of compact & related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S212 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - In Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100040Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback