FL H7011 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides & revises requirements relating to improvement of student literacy skills; requires DOE, in consultation with Office of Early Learning, to implement coordinated screening & progress monitoring system for VPK program through grade 8; establishes Reading Achievement Initiative for Scholastic Excellence Program within DOE; revises requirements relating to specified reading instruction allocation; revises requirements for certain instructional personnel & professional development program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Literacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#195 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06 Chapter No. 2021-9
2021-05-04 Approved by Governor
2021-05-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted for SB 1898
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2021-04-21SenateReceived
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-21SenateIn Messages
2021-04-21HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-21HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 073609 adopted
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 073609 filed
2021-04-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-15HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-15HouseCS Filed
2021-04-15HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Education & Employment Committee
2021-04-15HouseFavorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Education & Employment Committee agenda
2021-03-17HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-17HouseReported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-15HouseAdded to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-04House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1898 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7011 (Ch. 2021-9), CS/CS/HB 419 (Ch. 2021-10), CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228)
H419 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Chapter No. 2021-10
H1159 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-228; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7011 (Ch. 2021-9), CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S934 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228), CS/HB 7011 (Ch. 2021-9), CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1282 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 419 (Ch. 2021-10), CS/HB 7011 (Ch. 2021-9)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100269Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008365Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101298Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012986Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Amendment/022269/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Amendment/073609/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Analyses/h7011.PKA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Analyses/h7011a.PKA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Analyses/h7011b.EEC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Analyses/h7011c.EEC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Analyses/h7011z.ELE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Vote/HouseVote_h07011e1195.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7011/Vote/SenateVote_h07011e1057.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58634&IsPCB=0&BillId=72868
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60452&IsPCB=0&BillId=72868

Bill Comments

feedback