FL H7009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires panel to annually adopt statewide workers' compensation schedules of maximum reimbursement allowances; extends timeframes in which employees may receive certain workers' compensation benefits & in which carrier must notify treating doctor of certain requirements; revises provisions relating to retainer agreements & awarding attorney fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#502 (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HousePassed; YEAS 74 NAYS 30
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-11-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2017-11-17HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4401915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627211Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback