FL H7009 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-35
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts 2015 version of Internal Revenue Code; incorporates reference to recent federal act into state law for purpose of defining "adjusted federal income"; revises treatment by this state of certain depreciation & expensing of assets that are allowed for federal income tax purposes; authorizes DOR to adopt emergency rules; provides retroactive applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15 Chapter No. 2015-35
2015-05-14 Approved by Governor
2015-05-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-02SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-01SenateSubstituted for SB 7014
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-01SenateWithdrawn from Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy
2015-03-31SenateReceived
2015-03-27SenateReferred to Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy
2015-03-26SenateIn Messages
2015-03-18HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-03-18HouseRead 3rd time
2015-03-17HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-03-17HouseRead 2nd time
2015-03-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7014 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2015-35)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100997Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback