FL H7007 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to state, state university, & community college employee lobbyists; provides state policy relating to sexual harassment; provides criminal penalties; requires Legislature, Supreme Court, & agencies to establish & adopt rules, policies, & procedures; prohibits certain public officers & employees from soliciting specified employment & contractual relationships; revises lobbyist registration, compensation report, principal designation cancellation, & investigation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#672 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time 734
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time 668
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-07HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-07HouseCS referred to Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-05HouseCS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time
2018-02-05HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-01HouseCS by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1534 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H1233 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
S1628 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages
H7091 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1916 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1101221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25382Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback