FL H7001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution prohibiting legislators & statewide elected officers from personally representing another person or entity for compensation before any state government body or state agency except judicial tribunals for six years following vacation of office; provides that prohibition applies to individuals who were members of legislature or who were statewide elected officers at any time after November 8, 2016.
Title
State Officers Post-service Personal Representation Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 4 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17 |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Rules and Policy Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-21 | House | CS by- Rules and Policy Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Rules and Policy Committee, 02/21/17, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules and Policy Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7003 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H7083 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H7083 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections