FL H6517 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for appropriation to compensate Robert Allan Smith for injuries sustained as result of negligence of Orange County employee; provides legislative intent regarding lien interests held by state; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Robert Allan Smith/Orange County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#153 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-187
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 3
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 34
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-17SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S34 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6517 (Ch. 2019-187)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback