FL H6507 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriation from DOC to compensate Maury Hernandez for injuries & damages sustained as result of alleged negligence of DOC; provides legislative intent for waiver of certain liens; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Maury Hernandez/Department of Corrections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-09-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S20 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback