FL H6505 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Robert Earl DuBoise; provides appropriation to compensate him for being wrongfully incarcerated for 37 years; directs Chief Financial Officer to draw warrant payable directly to Mr. DuBoise; specifies conditions for payment; provides that act does not waive certain defenses or increase state's limits of liability; provides that certain benefits are vacated upon specified findings.
Title
Relief/Robert Earl DuBoise/State of Florida
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Learned [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. Yvonne Hayes Hinson [D] |
Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] | Rep. Patt Maney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S504 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6505 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6505/BillText/Filed/PDF |