FL H6505 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriation from DOH to compensate Vonshelle Brothers & daughter Iyonna Hughey for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of Brevard County Health Department; provides limitation on payment of compensation, fees, & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Vonshelle Brothers/Department of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#736 (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-163
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for SB 42
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HousePassed; YEAS 108 NAYS 4
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-21HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-02-13HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-25HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-09-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S42 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6505

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback