FL H6119 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals chapter 908, F.S, relating to federal immigration enforcement.
Title
Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6113 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
908 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
908 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6119 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6119/BillText/Filed/PDF |