FL H6083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes annual indexing of fuel sales tax rates.
Title
Fuel Sales Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-22 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6083 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6083/BillText/Filed/PDF |