FL H6081 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to regulation of tobacco & nicotine products.
Title
Preemption of the Regulation of Tobacco and Nicotine Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1022 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H6113 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
H6113 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
569 | 0025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6081 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6081/BillText/Filed/PDF |