FL H6081 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions prohibiting owner of land, or owner of conservation easement over land, to voluntarily negotiate sale or use of such land or easement for construction & operation of linear facilities.
Title
Conservation Easements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
570 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
704 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6081 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6081/BillText/Filed/PDF |