FL H6075 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to publication of minutes of county school board or board of county commissioners in newspaper of general circulation in Calhoun, Clay, Gulf, Holmes, Liberty, Wakulla, & Washington Counties, respectively, & City of Leesburg.
Title
Required Publication of Local Board Meeting Minutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-24 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1564 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs