FL H6067 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provision providing for future repeal of provisions relating to issuance, renewal, & revocation of health access dental licenses.
Title
Health Access Dental Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6067 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6067/BillText/Filed/PDF |