FL H6065 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions requiring portion of punitive damages awarded for certain claims relating to nursing homes & assisted living facilities to be deposited into Quality of Long-Term Care Facility Improvement Trust Fund.
Title
Quality of Long-Term Care Facility Improvement Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1880 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 0238 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0239 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 298 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |