FL H6059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions relating to confidentiality & exemption from public records requirements of information concerning plans, intentions, or interests of private entity entering into certain agreements with economic development agency.
Title
Confidentiality of Economic Development Agreement Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1896 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6059 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6059/BillText/Filed/PDF |