FL H6059 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes certain regional corridor terminus from Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Composition of the Multi-use Corridors of Regional Economic Significance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#159 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseImmediately certified
2021-04-15HousePassed; YEAS 115, NAYS 2
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-03HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-03HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-22HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1590 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3382278Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback