FL H6057 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals Sports Development Program.
Title
Sports Development Program
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-27 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/27/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-21 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Favorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 11625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6057 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6057/BillText/Filed/PDF |