FL H6055 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to regulation of telegraph companies and telegrams.
Title
Telegraph Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#443 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#443 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-143 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1256 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1256 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6055
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
363 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
363 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |