FL H6053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes provision prohibiting specified local governments from adopting ordinances or rules imposing price controls upon certain business activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rent Control Measures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1390 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1250103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166043Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback