FL H6053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to school grading system, school report cards, & district grades.
Title
School Grading System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-12-13 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 3415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 6202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6053 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6053/BillText/Filed/PDF |