FL H6049 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions prohibiting local governments from recognizing or granting certain legal rights to natural environment or granting such rights relating to natural environment to person or political subdivision
Title
Legal Rights of the Natural Environment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6049 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6049/BillText/Filed/PDF |