FL H6047 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes requirement delaying abortion procedure; removes prohibition on expenditures or funds for or initiation or renewal of contracts with certain organizations that perform abortions under certain circumstances; removes requirement that AHCA review abortion clinic patient records as component of licensure inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reproductive Issues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H271 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback