FL H6047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-96
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abrogates scheduled reversion of provisions related to distribution of funds in ABLE account upon death of designated beneficiary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida ABLE Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#217 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-96
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 882
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for SB 1300
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HousePassed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-16HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-09HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1300 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6047

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback