FL H6041 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provision preempting the regulation of over-the-counter proprietary drugs and cosmetics to the state.
Title
Preemption of Over-the-counter Drugs and Cosmetics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1174 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6041 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6041/BillText/Filed/PDF |