FL H6041 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing Division of Historical Resources responsibilities in issuing permits for survey, excavation, & salvage activities on certain state-owned lands; repeals provisions relating to abrogation of offensive & derogatory geographic place names & division's authority to implement program for certain artifacts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Historical Resources

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#718 (Y: 94 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HousePassed; YEAS 94 NAYS 18
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 7
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-31HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1296 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
267031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2670625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
267115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback