FL H6031 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to limitation of size of individual wine containers.
Title
Individual Wine Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#515 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-10 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) |
2022-01-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-02 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-09-29 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-09-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S384 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries