FL H6019 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions providing for death penalty for capital felonies and associated provisions.
Title
Death Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 5304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
913 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
925 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6019 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6019/BillText/Filed/PDF |