FL H6019 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions requiring portion of punitive damages awarded for certain claims relating to nursing homes & assisted living facilities be deposited into Quality of Long-Term Care Facility Improvement Trust Fund.
Title
Punitive Damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 0238 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0239 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 298 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6019 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6019/BillText/Filed/PDF |