FL H6011 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriation to compensate estate for Danielle Maudsley's death as result of alleged negligence of Trooper Daniel Cole & Florida Highway Patrol; provides limitation on payment of compensation & attorney fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Danielle Maudsley/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-22HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-11-22HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-11-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S4 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback