FL H6009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Mark Wandall Traffic Safety Program & authorization to use traffic infraction detectors; repeals provisions relating to distribution of penalties, transitional implementation, & placement & installation; conforms cross-references & provisions to changes made by act.
Title
Traffic Infraction Detectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-12-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1531 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 00831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 07456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0776 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6009/BillText/Filed/PDF |