FL H6009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to write-in candidate residency requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Write-In Candidates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#561 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-141
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 3
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for SB 582
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18HouseFavorable by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-11HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-10-11HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-10-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-09-06HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2017-08-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S582 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6009

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
990615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback