FL H6005 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 62 (Ch. 2023-320)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 62 (Ch. 2023-320)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Robert Earl DuBoise for being wrongfully incarcerated for almost 37 years; directs CFO to draw warrant payable directly to Mr. DuBoise; provides for waiver of tuition & fees; declares Legislature does not waive certain defenses or increase state's limits of liability; prohibits funds awarded from being used or paid for specified attorney or lobbying fees; prohibits Mr. DuBoise from submitting compensation application under certain provisions upon his receipt of payment; provides that certain benefits are vacated upon specified findings.
Title
Relief/Robert Earl DuBoise/State of Florida
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 62 (Ch. 2023-320) |
2023-04-28 | House | Substituted SB 62 |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-04-17 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-14 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-01-17 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S62 (Same As) 2023-07-10 - Chapter No. 2023-320