FL H6003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions authorizing seizure of firearms from persons in certain circumstances, prohibition on firearms ownership or possession until removal of firearm possession & firearm ownership disability, prohibition on persons younger than 21 years of age from purchasing firearms, certain exemptions from firearms purchase waiting period, ban on bump-fire stock, & statute authorizing risk protection orders.
Title
Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-08-09 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6003 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6003/BillText/Filed/PDF |