FL H5713 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides job-related travel & reimbursement reporting requirements for state agency heads & other specified state officials.
Title
Agency Travel [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Rep. David Rivera [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0029 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Roll Call No. 0666 - Passage (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House Roll Call No. 0636 - (Y: 58 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House Roll Call No. 0635 - Quorum (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Roll Call No. 0666 - Passage (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House Roll Call No. 0636 - (Y: 58 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House Roll Call No. 0635 - Quorum (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152) | |
2010-04-19 | Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-16 | Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648 | |
2010-04-06 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-06 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00423; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 00423; Read 2nd time -SJ 00509; Amendment(s) adopted (410614) -SJ 00509; Read 3rd time -SJ 00509; Passed as amended (410614); YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 00509; Immediately certified -SJ 00509; Refused to concur, acceded to the request of the House for conference -SJ 00509 | |
2010-04-05 | Received -SJ 00420; Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00421 | |
2010-04-01 | In Messages | |
2010-04-01 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00467; Passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 00467; Immediately certified -HJ 00470; Requests the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 00470 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00439; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00439 | |
2010-03-23 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00371; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00371 |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0020 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0020 | 059 | New Code | See Bill Text |