FL H5603 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Read 3rd time -HJ 470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to reimbursement of DMS for actual costs of coordinating Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; provides for transfer of funds generated by fees collected for use of DMS's online procurement systems & electronic information services from DMS to DFS to support statewide purchasing operations; establishes amount of transfer; provides for annual transfer of specified excess revenue from fees collected for use of such systems & services to GR, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Management Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-07 Read 3rd time -HJ 470
2011-04-06 Read 2nd time -HJ 443
2011-04-01 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-03-31 Placed on Calendar -HJ 393
2011-03-30 Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 3 -HJ 393
2011-03-28 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/30/11, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-24 Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 311
2011-03-23 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287161Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback