FL H5301 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-156; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-156; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms cross-reference to changes made by act; revises requirements for nursing home lease bond alternative fees; provides for flexibility in how to meet minimum staffing requirements for nursing home facilities; revises expiration date of provisions authorizing federal waiver for certain persons age 65 & over or who have disability; revises expiration date of provisions authorizing specified medically needy program, etc.
Title
Medicaid Services [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0064 - Conference Committee Report (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1111 - Passage (Y: 77 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Roll Call No. 0645 - Passage (Y: 77 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1111 - Passage (Y: 77 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0010 - Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - House Roll Call No. 0645 - Passage (Y: 77 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-156; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152) | |
2010-05-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01695 | |
2010-04-30 | In returning messages; Conference Committee Report received -SJ 01518; Conference Committee Report adopted -SJ 01525; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report (286391); YEAS 37 NAYS 1 -SJ 01525 | |
2010-04-30 | Conference Committee Report received; Conference Committee Report adopted -HJ 01379; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 77 NAYS 43 -HJ 01378 | |
2010-04-19 | Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-16 | Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648 | |
2010-04-06 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-06 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00423; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 00423; Read 2nd time -SJ 00489; Amendment(s) adopted (745712) -SJ 00490; Read 3rd time -SJ 00494; Passed as amended (745712); YEAS 27 NAYS 12 -SJ 00494; Immediately certified -SJ 00494; Refused to concur, acceded to the request of the House for conference -SJ 00509 | |
2010-04-05 | Received -SJ 00415; Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00416 | |
2010-04-01 | In Messages | |
2010-04-01 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00458; Passed; YEAS 77 NAYS 41 -HJ 00458; Immediately certified -HJ 00470; Requests the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to conference -HJ 00470 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00433 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable by- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 -HJ 00381; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00381 | |
2010-03-19 | On Council agenda-- Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development, 03/23/10, 11:15 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00340 | |
2010-03-17 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00306 |
Same As/Similar To
S1464 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156)
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144)
S2434 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00896; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1143 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00896
H5001 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Line Item Veto Message received -HJ 00012; Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2700 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), HB 5003 (Ch. 2010-153), CS/HB 5101 (Ch. 2010-154), HB 5201 (Ch. 2010-155), HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), HB 5305 (Ch. 2010-158), HB 5307 (Ch. 2010-159), HB 5309 (Ch. 2010-160), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), HB 5501 (Ch. 2010-163), HB 5505 (Ch. 2010-164), HB 5705 (Ch. 2010-165), CS/HB 5801 (Ch. 2010-166)
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H7225 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5303 (Ch. 2010-157), CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144)
S2434 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00896; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1143 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00896
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 179 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 9083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 9112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 9113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 9117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0430 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |