FL H5203 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes court to sentence certain offenders to county jail for up to 24 months if county has contract with DOC; provides contractual requirements; requires specific appropriations; provides for such appropriations; requires validation of per diem rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-01HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-03-30HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-25HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 1
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/25/15, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-03-19HouseIntroduced
2015-03-19HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2015-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
H7131 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
950021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback