FL H5201 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirement relating to contribution by residents of certain health care facilities; requires nursing homes to annually submit to AHCA financial data; extends postpartum Medicaid eligibility period for pregnant women; revises provisions relating to retroactive payments for Medicaid-covered services for certain eligible persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 2518
2021-04-08HouseSubstituted SB 2518
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-07HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-07HouseAmendment 925637 withdrawn
2021-04-02HouseAmendment 925637 filed
2021-04-01HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021)
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-31HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-31HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2021-03-31HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee
2021-03-29HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2021-03-29HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-25House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H645 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
H1617 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
S238 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
H5001 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2500 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Message sent to senate
S2518 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Message sent to senate

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400179Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62491Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback