FL H5101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends designation of certain hospitals as rural hospitals; removes community intermediate care facilities for developmentally disabled from statutory rate freeze; updates references to data used for calculating disproportionate share program payments to certain hospitals; provides for certain rebates to be placed in GRF unallocated; provides for deposit of contributions into Grants & Donations Trust Fund; repeals provisions relating to state & local Medicaid partnerships; removes requirement that AHCA support Healthy Start services with public expenditures & federal matching funds; specifies factors agency must consider to reconcile payments to long-term care managed care plans.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Laid on Table |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-25 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 7 |
2015-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/25/15, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2512 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5101 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5101/BillText/Filed/PDF |