FL H5009 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state group insurance program to include high deductible plans; requires employees hired after specified date to participate in high-deductible plan; revises state's monthly contribution for certain employees under state group insurance program; specifies circumstances in which act does not take effect.
Title
State Group Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7097 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5009 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/5009/BillText/Filed/PDF |