FL H4973 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1638A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1638A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Manatee County Port Authority Port Manatee Seagrass Mitigation at Perico Preserve.
Title
Manatee County Port Authority Port Manatee Seagrass Mitigation at Perico Preserve
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1638A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4973 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4973/BillText/Filed/PDF |