FL H4955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Clay County Utility Authority Water Resiliency Program North Middleburg Project.
Title
Clay County Utility Authority Water Resiliency Program North Middleburg Project
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-17 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/20, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-04 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4955 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4955/BillText/Filed/PDF |