FL H4927 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1935B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1935B)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Expansion of Manatee Rehabilitation at The Bishop Museum of Science and Nature.
Title
Expansion of Manatee Rehabilitation at The Bishop Museum of Science and Nature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1935B) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-12-22 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-07 | House | Filed |